U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sorensen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Transcript OR Ex Parte Transcript]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Verdict]
  • March 20, 2025: [Jury Question]
  • March 20, 2025: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • March 20, 2025: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 20, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 20, 2025: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 19, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 18, 2025: [Jury List]
  • March 18, 2025: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • March 18, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 11, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 11, 2025: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.