U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-30043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Witt et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 08, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 31, 2025: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 31, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 24, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Return of Property]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.