U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rondeau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [1 - Seal Document Not Docket Entry]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 12, 2025: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Jury Questionnaires]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • April 11, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • April 09, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.