U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Renville
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.