U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bobtail Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 09, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 09, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 18, 2025: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 10, 2025: [Furlough]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.