U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-40040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burnett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.