U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-40010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Forfeiture]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 25, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.