U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50015-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Calderon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 12, 2025: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 12, 2025: [Transcript OR Ex Parte Transcript]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2025: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 06, 2025: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 05, 2025: [Letter]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 30, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2025: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • April 25, 2025: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 08, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 02, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 27, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 27, 2025: [Consent]
  • March 26, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 17, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 17, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extend]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.