U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-40046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawkwing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 07, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.