U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-30083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kucera et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 09, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 09, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • April 09, 2025: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 09, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Consent]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.