U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-04024
  • Case Name: Anderson v. Halliday, Watkins, Mann, PC et. al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 18, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 18, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • April 17, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 17, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2025: [Pro Se Registration for Electronic Notice (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Joinder]
  • March 25, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement (attorney use)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 20, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 20, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement (attorney use)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response]
  • March 14, 2025: [Return of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Affidavit in Support]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Clerks Denial of Default]
  • March 13, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Noncompliance (Corporate Disclosure Statement)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.