U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunts Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 05, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 02, 2025: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 02, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extend]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.