U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Helgeson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 08, 2025: [Forfeiture]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 24, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.