U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-mj-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Combe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2025: [Waiver]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Complaint under Rule 5 - Out to Other Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.