U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-04061
  • Case Name: Erickson v. Franken Custom, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Brief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response]
  • May 01, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to Motion Response]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response]
  • April 30, 2025: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extend Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extend]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Statement of Material Facts (attorney use)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.