U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-30017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benoist
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 08, 2025: [Text Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 08, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 08, 2025: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 08, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • May 08, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 07, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.