U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-30023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Withorn, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Request]
  • March 18, 2025: [Request]
  • March 18, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 17, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.