U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 21, 2025: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 20, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 18, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.