U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40031
  • Case Name: Caleb Michael Hargreaves and Amanda Marie Hargreaves
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (text order)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (text order)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.