U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40018
  • Case Name: Trey Allen Bren
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modified Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (text order)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.