U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40028
  • Case Name: Laurie Jean Morrison
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (text order)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.