U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extend]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extend]
  • March 14, 2025: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.