U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-30019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oliver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Request]
  • March 21, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 20, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.