U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40063
  • Case Name: Richard Alan Barrett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Certificate of Counseling]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.