U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40062
  • Case Name: Tammy Marie Steger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (text order)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Change of Address (debtor) (text entry only)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.