U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hardiman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 11, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 09, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 28, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.