U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wahl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • April 11, 2025: [Produce ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2025: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • March 20, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.