U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sutton et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 09, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • April 22, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.