U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30002
  • Case Name: Gary James Budish
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Change of Address (debtor) (text entry only)]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Counseling]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.