U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50016
  • Case Name: Kendra Evelyn Christensen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Amendment]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule G]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule C]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Nonstandard Order]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule G]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule C]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Petition with Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.