U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-mj-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chappelle
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Terminate Magistrate Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 17, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Seal Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.