U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ismail
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2025: [Declaration of Publication]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 27, 2025: [Forfeiture]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.