U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-30087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Shell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 24, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Quash]
  • April 15, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.