U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40064
  • Case Name: Richard Kevin Carroll and Tammy Lynn Carroll
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (text order)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Debtor Education]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Counseling]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.