U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40054
  • Case Name: Guillermo Israel Macedonio Vazquez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.