U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richmond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extend]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss Indictment/Information/Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response]
  • April 21, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response]
  • April 15, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 14, 2025: [Suppress]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Received]
  • March 31, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2025: [Transcript OR Ex Parte Transcript]
  • March 18, 2025: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 18, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.