U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • May 09, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2025: [Arraignment]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 30, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extend]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • March 19, 2025: [Bill of Particulars]
  • March 19, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 19, 2025: [Jury List]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.