U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10010
  • Case Name: Jason Wade Prater
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (no notice)]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Counseling]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.