U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bertrand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2025: [Consent]
  • May 12, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.