U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50056-3
  • Case Name: USA v. High Hawk et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 02, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.