U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chappelle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.