U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-30088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bettelyoun
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 24, 2025: [Furlough]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.