U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-50080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ratliff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 09, 2025: [Forfeiture]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 07, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 07, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 07, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.