U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-40132-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Cruz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2025: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 12, 2025: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 12, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 09, 2025: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.