U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-30084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leader Charge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 13, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: [Consent]
  • May 09, 2025: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • May 09, 2025: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 07, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 25, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.