U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50020-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Sertuche et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 12, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 12, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 09, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 09, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 28, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 28, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 23, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2025: [Furlough]
  • April 15, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 02, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 02, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 02, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 25, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.