U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-30051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fast Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 09, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 06, 2025: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.