U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40041
  • Case Name: Lashunta Therese Jenkins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (text order)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.