U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-30075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Moccasin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • April 23, 2025: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 03, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 27, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2025: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 27, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 27, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.