U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-40027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acosta et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 06, 2025: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 05, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 05, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Redacted Charging Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • May 01, 2025: [Bail Report]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 29, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2025: [Redacted Charging Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 28, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 23, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 22, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 28, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 28, 2025: [Redacted Charging Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 27, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.